Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBronson et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2018cv03156
Date Filed2018-05-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffJennifer Bronson
PlaintiffClement Chin
PlaintiffKevin Shimamoto
Case DescriptionJennifer Bronson, Clement Chin, and Kevin Shimamoto, managing members of North America 3PL and Berkeley Healthcare Dynamic, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records of communications referencing the two companies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bronson, Chin, and Shimamoto filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [15]
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-251COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. § 552 against United States Customs and Border Protection ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12387061.). Filed byJennifer Bronson, Kevin Shimamoto, Clement Chin. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Suzette) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-252Proposed Summons. (Barnes, Suzette) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-293Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/12/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-294Summons Issued as to United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-295Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-086CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jennifer Bronson, Clement Chin, Kevin Shimamoto.. (Barnes, Suzette) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-197CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer Bronson, Clement Chin, Kevin Shimamoto on May 30, 2018 for Complaint; Summons; Standing Order of Magistrate Kandis A. Westmore; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference Deadlines; and Form of Consent/Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Barnes, Suzette) (Filed on 6/19/2018) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-07-068Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Customs and Border Protection. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/6/2018) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-129CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/26/2018. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1710CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Customs and Border Protection. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/17/2018) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-08-1411ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-1412NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Alison E. Daw for Defendant CBP (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 8/14/2018) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-1613STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DATES filed by United States Customs and Border Protection, Clement Chin, Jennifer Bronson and Kevin Shimamoto. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/17/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-1714STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Corrected] filed by United States Customs and Border Protection, Kevin Shimamoto, Clement Chin and Jennifer Bronson. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 8/17/2018) Modified on 8/20/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-1715STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Corrected] filed by Clement Chin, United States Customs and Border Protection, Jennifer Bronson, Kevin Shimamoto. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/17/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-2716ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-2817STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Dates and Opt-Out of Multi-Option ADR filed by United States Customs and Border Protection, Kevin Shimaoto, Clement Chin, and Jennifer Bronson. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 8/28/2018) Modified on 8/29/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-09-0418STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Dates and Opt-Out of Multi-Option ADR filed by Clement Chin, United States Customs and Border Protection, Jennifer Bronson, Kevin Shimamoto. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2018 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/4/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-11-0119CLERK'S NOTICE- Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for November 13, 2018, is continued to November 20, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by November 13, 2018 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0920STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DATES filed by Jennifer Bronson, Clement Chin, Kevin Shimamoto and United States Customs and Border Protection. (Barnes, Suzette) (Filed on 11/9/2018) Modified on 11/13/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-1321JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Customs and Border Protection Jennifer Bronson, Kevin Shimamoto and Clement Chin. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 11/13/2018) Modified on 11/14/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-1422Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Dates. Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2018 01:30 PM.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018) Modified on 11/16/2018 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-0423Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/4/2018. Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2019 01:30 PM.FTR Time: 1:33-1:39. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-07CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-0724CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CALL: This case was referred for a settlement conference to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court sets a call with the parties to discuss the timing and logistics of the settlement conference for 12/14/2018 at 9:00 AM . The court will email a call-in number separately. If this date does not work, parties may request to change the date by stipulation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-1025CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CALL: Settlement Conference Call set for 12/14/2018 at 9:00 AM is reset to 9:15 AM . The call-in information remains the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1426CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULING CALL: The court apologizes to the parties but has an unexpected calendared matter and thus resets the schedule call to Thursday 12/20/2018 at 11:00 am . The court will circulate a call-in number separately. The court also has time on Tuesday, 12/18 if that timing works better for the parties. They may email lbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov to arrange that change or call courtroom deputy Elaine Kabiling at 415-522-3140. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-2027Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference call held on 12/20/2018. The court held a settlement-conference call with the parties. The plaintiff will make a settlement demand by January 15, 2019. The parties will update the court about their settlement posture on January 31, 2019 by joint email to lbsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov. (Not Reported). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2018) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2019-02-0128CLERK'S NOTICE. The court thanks the parties for their emailed update and recognizes the delay caused by the January government shutdown. The court extends the deadline for the parties to file an update about their settlement posture to February 14, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-1929Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Settlement Conference held on 2/19/2019. The court had further settlement communications with the parties, who will update the court again on March 15, 2019 by email to lbsettlement@cand.uscourts.gov. (Not Reported). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/19/2019) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-03-1530STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Case Management Conference - Initial,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by United States Customs and Border Protection, Jennifer Bronson, Clement Chin and Kevin Shimamoto. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 3/15/2019) Modified on 3/15/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar