Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKosti v. Central Intelligence Agency
DistrictDistrict of Utah
CityCentral
Case Number2:2018cv00410
Date Filed2018-05-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert J. Shelby
PlaintiffKaden Stephan Kosti
Case DescriptionKaden Kosti submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning claims that he was being surveilled. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Kosti filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-251**SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead for review, case file forwarded to Magistrate Judge. (Received by the court on: 05/25/2018) filed by Plaintiff Kaden Stephan Kosti. (tlh) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-042ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 05/30/2018. (tlh) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-043COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency (Originally received by the court on 05/25/2018). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Kaden Stephan Kosti. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (tlh) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-154ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells under 28:636 (b)(1)(B), Magistrate to handle case up to and including R&R on all dispositive matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/15/2018. (mjm) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar