Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01243
Date Filed2018-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the number of refugees from Afghanistan, Iraq, and Somalia who had returned to their home country after efforts to resettle them in the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5504132) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of State)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsth) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-064NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of All Defendants (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-125ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/4/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) Modified on 6/13/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/4/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/4/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/04/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/7/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-127GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 12, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-13NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and counsel refiled said pleading as docket entry no. 6 . (ztd) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-07-058NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-059ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-06MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before July 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 6, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings due by 7/27/2018. (hs) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff