Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01244
Date Filed2018-05-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning sites considered for resettlement of refugees in 2015 and 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5504160) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of State)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-29Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-124RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/4/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/4/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/04/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/7/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-035Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-05MINUTE ORDER granting the 5 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint. The defendant's answer or other response to the complaint shall be filed on or before July 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 5, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/11/2018. (JK) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-116ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-08-08MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report no later than August 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 8, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-277Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 13, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-11-148Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar