Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01252
Date Filed2018-05-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning contracts awarded to Christopher Steele, Fusion GPS, Sidney Blumenthal, and others. Citizens United also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but told Citizens United that it was closing the request for failure to sufficiently describe the records with a contract number. Since the State Department did not inform Citizens United of its right to appeal, it did not appeal the closing of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-301COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5506057) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to Dept of State, # 4 Summons US Attorney, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-302LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-30Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsth) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-07-114NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-115Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file an answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by September 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/13/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff