Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01289
Date Filed2018-05-31
Date Closed2018-06-12
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Case DescriptionThe Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the agency's demands that Twitter reveal the identity of an individual using the @ALT_uscis account. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing from the agency concerning its request, the Reporters Committee filed a second FOIA request for records concerning the processing of the first FOIA request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the second request as well, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Reporters Committee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-311COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5510037) filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons to Defendant CBP, # 8 Summons to Defendant DHS, # 9 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 10 Summons to U.S. Attorney General)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-312NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-00155. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-04Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-043SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-044STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/4/2018. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-085Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/11/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/11/2018. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/11/18. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 6/11/2018 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/11/2018 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff