Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMark Hezinger v. United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2018cv04969
Date Filed2018-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Consuelo B. Marshall
PlaintiffMark Hezinger
Case DescriptionMark Hezinger submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Central District of California for records on himself. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Hezinger filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California
DefendantNational Security Division
DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantLos Angeles Police Department
DefendantLos Angeles Police Department
TERMINATED: 10/05/2018
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-041COMPLAINT against Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Los Angeles Police Department, National Security Division, United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California. Case assigned to Judge Consuelo B. Marshall for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Filing Fee $ 400 PAID), filed by Plaintiff Mark Hezinger. (Additional attachment(s): # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh). (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-04260 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendant United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-043CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mark Hezinger, (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-044NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-075STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-136APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Mark Hezinger. (bm) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-157ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: granting 6 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (bm) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-07-118SUBMISSION BY PLAINTIFF OF PROOF OF SERVICE TO ALL DEFENDANTS filed by Plaintiffs in Pro Per Mark Hezinger.(ab) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-279NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. Motion set for hearing on 9/4/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion to dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Arlene Nancy Hoang added to party Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft)) (Hoang, Arlene) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-2710CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department, identifying City of Los Angeles. (Hoang, Arlene) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-2411REQUEST FOR EXTENSION filed by plaintiff Mark Hezinger. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (bm) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-2712MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND [DKT. NO. 11] AND CONTINUING HEARING by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall granting 11 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File: The matter before the Court is Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file an opposition to Defendant Los Angeles Police Department's motion to dismiss. (Dkt. No. 11.) The request is GRANTED. The hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 9) is hereby continued to October 2, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file his opposition no later than September 11, 2018. Defendant shall file its reply no later than September 18, 2018. (bm) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-3113PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mark Hezinger, upon Defendants served on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by unspecified means. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to not indicated. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to not indicated. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (bm) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-1014MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and filed by Plaintiff Mark Hezinger. (yl) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-1015PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Mark Hezinger. The Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Defendant LAPD to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-1416EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by plaintiff Mark Hezinger. (bm) : # 1 Proposed Order) (bm). (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1417MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION 16 filed by Plaintiff Mark Hezinger. (bm) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1418PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Mark Hezinger, re EX PARTE APPLICATION 16 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 17 , served on 9/14/18. (bm) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-1719OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order 16 filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. (Hoang, Arlene) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-1720REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Defendant Los Angeles Police Department. (Hoang, Arlene) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-2021EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 10/30/2018 re Complaint - (Discovery),, 1 filed by Federal Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Division, United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Department of Justice(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party National Security Division(pty:dft), Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California(pty:dft)) (Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-2622MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION [DKT. NO. 16] WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO PLAINTIFF'S FILING A REGULARLY NOTICED MOTION by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall denying 16 EX PARTE APPLICATION: Accordingly, Plaintiff's ex parte application is denied without prejudice to his filing a regularly noticed motion addressing the same topic. Plaintiff is also advised that there is a federal pro se clinic available to help pro se litigants with various matters relating to federal litigation. Information is available at: http://prose.cacd.uscourts.gov/los-angeles. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-2723MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER RE: UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall granting 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION: Before the Court is Defendants' ex parte application requesting an extension of time to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint in this action. (Dkt. No. 21.) Defense counsel indicates in a declaration that Plaintiff does not oppose the request. (Medrano Decl. 9.) Accordingly, the request is granted. Defendants' response to the complaint shall be filed no later than October 30, 2018. However, future unopposed ex parte applications will not be granted unless accompanied by a showing as to why the parties were unable to proceed by stipulation rather than ex parte application. (bm) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-0224MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT 9 Hearing held before Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The case is called and counsel states her appearance. No appearance made on behalf of plaintiff. The Court and counsel confer. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. A written order will issue. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (bm) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-0525ORDER DISMISSING CLAIM AGAINST THE LOS ANGELES POLICE DEPARTMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE [DKT. NO. 9] by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: The Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs sole cause of action against the Los Angeles Police Department for lack for subject-matter jurisdiction. This dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's refiling the claim in state court. (see document for further details) (bm) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-3026ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, 1 filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Division, United States Attorneys Office for the Central District of California.(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar