Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01321
Date Filed2018-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning all non-classified emails sent or received by the agency pertaining to North Korea from June 25, 2017 to July 10, 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5515090) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to State)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-042LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-04Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-054STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/5/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-145NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/5/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/11/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/11/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-057ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-06MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 24, 2018, at 2:15 p.m., in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer prior to the status conference to discuss the status of the Department's search and scheduling for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/6/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/24/2018, at 2:15 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff