Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01333
Date Filed2018-06-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning all communications sent by former Assistant Attorney General for the National Security Division John Carlin pertaining to Michael Flynn and issues involving the Russia investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5518396) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-05Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsth) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/18/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/18/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/18/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-195NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-196ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-20MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before August 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 20, 2018. (JPF) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-097Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 7 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 10, 2018 (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-11-088Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-09MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that (1) the National Security Division, on behalf of the defendant Department of Justice, shall complete the outstanding searches for all four of the plaintiff's requests for records on or before November 30, 2018, (2) the defendant shall provide a final production to the plaintiff on or before November 30, 2018, and (3) the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 10, 2018 updating the Court on the status of the searches and proposing a further processing schedule for any potentially responsive records that may be located. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 9, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar