Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBoutin Jones Inc. v. United States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
DistrictEastern District of California
CitySacramento
Case Number2:2018cv01648
Date Filed2018-06-06
Date Closed2018-07-05
JudgeDistrict Judge John A. Mendez
PlaintiffBoutin Jones Inc.
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Boutin Jones submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning its client's cooperation in a sting operation that resulted in the conviction of Duong Chao for violations of California's cigarette tax laws. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Boutin Jones to provide a third-party authorization. Boutin Jones did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Boutin Jones filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-061COMPLAINT against U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives by Boutin Jones Inc. Attorney Chase, Michael E. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7701644) (Chase, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-062CIVIL COVER SHEET by Boutin Jones Inc. (Chase, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-073SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Michael E. Chase* *Boutin Jones Inc* *555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1500* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Becknal, R) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-074CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Order re Filing Requirements, # 3 VDRP) (Becknal, R) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-07-035NOTICE of Dismissal by Boutin Jones Inc.. (Chase, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-036CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Boutin Jones Inc. re 5 Notice - Other. (Chase, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-057CLERK'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to 5 Notice of Dismissal. CASE CLOSED. (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff