Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLATHAM & WATKINS LLP v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01340
Date Filed2018-06-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffLATHAM & WATKINS LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Latham & Watkins submitted a FOIA request on behalf of a client to the National Institute of Environmental Health Sciences for communications sent or received by agency employee Linda Birnbaum containing certain keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Latham & Watkins filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-061COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5519465) filed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons to United States Department of Health and Human Services, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons to U.S. Attorney for DC)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-062Corporate Disclosure Statement by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-07Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-07-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 6/14/2018 (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/11/2018. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/11/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/11/2018. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-107ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before July 24, 2018. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/10/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/24/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-118NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget R. Reineking on behalf of LATHAM & WATKINS LLP (Reineking, Bridget) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-249Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a subsequent joint status report on or before October 19, 2018, advising the court of the status of processing and producing responsive records in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/24/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-10-1810Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall report by November 19, 2018, whether summary judgment will be required and, if so, propose a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/19/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar