Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCommunity Legal Services in East Palo Alto et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al.,
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv03359
Date Filed2018-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffCommunity Legal Services in East Palo Alto
PlaintiffNational Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild
Case DescriptionThe Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto and the National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning prosecutorial discretion. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, provided two separate request numbers, but later consolidated the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-071COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF UNDER THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. 552; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12415195.). Filed byCommunity Legal Services in East Palo Alto, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/7/2018) Modified on 6/8/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-072Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-073Proposed Summons. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-074Certificate of Interested Entities by Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-07Electronic filing error . Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 1 Complaint, filed by National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guil d, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto Defendant Parties Entered Incorrectly (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-075Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2018 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/7/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-086Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-087CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-258CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2018 . (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-279CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-1110Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-1111CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/25/2018 . (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-1812CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/18/2018) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-08-1313ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/13/2018) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-1514ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/15/2018) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-27Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. The court has a scheduling conflict with the 9/6/2018 initial CMC and resets it to 9/27/2018 at 11:00 a.m. The parties must file their initial CMC statement at least seven days before the conference. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 8/27/2018) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-1815STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set/Reset Hearings, filed by Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/18/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-1816Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 15 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/27/2018 is reset to 12/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-11-1917CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The court has a calendar conflict and thus moves the 12/13/2018 calendar to 12/14/2018 . This does not alter the due date for any case filings. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-12-0418STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/4/2018) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0519CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2018-12-0520Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 18 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference, previously set for 12/14/2018, is reset to 2/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2019-02-0621CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: The court advances the start time of the CMC set for 2/14/2019 from 11:00 to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-0722JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/7/2019) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-1423Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Total Time in Court: 2 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Jennifer Stark. Defendants' Attorney: Rebecca Falk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2019) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-03-2624CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-04-0225CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The court has a scheduling conflict and resets the further CMC from 4/18/2019 to 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. The parties' joint CMC statement remains due on 4/11/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-0326CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-1127CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, National Immigration Project of the National Lawyers Guild. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-1128CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 4/25/2019 is reset to 6/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-1529CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 6/27/2019 is advanced to 6/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-06-1230CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-1331CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 6/20/2019 is reset to 8/22/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-07-1132NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Lisa Nicole Weissman Ward (Weissman Ward, Lisa) (Filed on 7/11/2019) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-1933NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Savith Iyengar (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-08-0834STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-0835Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 34 Stipulation Continuing Further Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 8/22/2019 is reset to 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-09-1636NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kenneth Warren Brakebill (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-10-0937CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 11:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-0938CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-1039CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 10/17/2019 is reset to 11/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-10-1540CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-11-0741CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/7/2019) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-0742CLERK'S NOTICE. Per the parties' joint request, ECF No. 41 , the court vacates the 11/14/2019 case-management conference and directs the parties to submit a further update by 12/12/2019 . As a calendaring device, the court also sets a further case-management conference for 12/19/2019 at 11:00 a.m. (If the conference turns out to be unnecessary, the parties can submit a stipulation to continue or vacate it.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-12-1243CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Managment Statement filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
2019-12-1244STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 43 Case Management Statement Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Case Management Hearing filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)
2019-12-1345Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 44 Stipulation Regarding Case Management Hearing. The case management conference previously set for 12/19/2019 is vacated. To avoid losing track of the case, the court sets a Status Conference for 2/20/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Status update due by 2/13/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019) (Entered: 12/13/2019)
2020-02-0346CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Status Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-1347STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 46 Clerk's Notice, filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 2/13/2020) (Entered: 02/13/2020)
2020-02-1448Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 47 Stipulation Regarding Case Management Hearing. The case management conference previously set for 2/20/2020 is vacated. To avoid losing track of the case, the court sets a Case Management Conference for 4/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor and directs the filing of a stipulated dismissal or a short update by 2/13/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-03-1849CLERK'S NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / MOTION HEARING: Through at least May 1, 2020, the court (under the new General Orders 72 and 73, available at https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/information-regarding-covid-19) will not have any in-person civil case-management conferences or civil-motions hearings and instead will have telephonic appearances or decide the matters on the papers. For now, the court is converting all appearances to telephone appearances but may on a case-by-case basis take things off calendar. For motions hearings, the court is open to hearings by Skype for Business or Google Hangouts (and may be able to use Zoom eventually). Telephonic appearances generally are by CourtCall, but the court also circulates the following conference number, which can accommodate up to 200 people and allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone: Dial In: 877-336-1839 Access Code: 8191201# Security Code: 200423# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-1950CLERK'S NOTICE RE: UPDATED CALL-IN INFORMATION FOR CMC/MOTION HEARING: The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone: Dial In: 877-336-1839 Access Code: 8191201# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-04-0351CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM . Dial In: 877-336-1839 Access Code: 8191201# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-1052STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Clerk's Notice, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 4/10/2020) (Entered: 04/10/2020)
2020-04-1353Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 52 Stipulation Regarding Extension. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 4/23/2020 is reset to 6/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor and directs the filing of a stipulated dismissal or a short update by 5/28/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-05-1154CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-2655CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/4/2020 at 9:30 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the hearing must be done by sending a list of names of participating counsel to lbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on Wednesday, June 3, 2020 . All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/83372151690?pwd=SUR5OUtVbGpTdVdQNGk4ZHJVaW1xQT09 Meeting ID: 833 7215 1690 Password: 469885 Dial by your location +1 929 205 6099 US (New York) +1 253 215 8782 US +1 301 715 8592 US +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose) Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjo For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associate d with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-2756STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension filed by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/27/2020) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-2857Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 56 Stipulation Regarding Extension. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 6/4/2020 is reset to 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-2858CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-07-0759CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 9:30 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1614698626?pwd=eXlQRThFajBjT0tieVBaYWpjMjFodz09 Meeting ID: 161 469 8626 Password: 546984 Dial by your location +1 929 205 6099 US (New York) +1 253 215 8782 US +1 301 715 8592 US +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose) Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjo For important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (Related documents(s) 58 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associate d with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar