Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01364
Date Filed2018-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Government Accountability Project submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning attempts to resettle immigrants deported from the U.S. since 2015. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. GAP filed administrative appeals of the agency's constructive denials of its requests. After hearing nothing further pertaining to its requests, GAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
Complaint attachment 30
Complaint attachment 31
Complaint attachment 32
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-081COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5524434) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit AB, # 29 Exhibit AC, # 30 Exhibit AD, # 31 Civil Cover Sheet, # 32 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-082NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-08Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-123SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 6/15/2018 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 6/15/2018 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/18/2018. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/18/2018. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-178ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of their production of documents to plaintiff, on or before August 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/18/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-249NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney Alexander D. Shoaibi (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-08-1510STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must file another status report by September 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/17/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-09-1811STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-21MINUTE ORDER. Defendant must file an updated status report by October 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/21/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-1812STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-22MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must file an updated status report by November 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-2013STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-28MINUTE ORDER. Defendants must provide an updated status report by January 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/28/2018. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2019-01-0314Consent MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay. Defendants must notify the Court within two business days of the resumption of government operations and propose a revised schedule for the filing of the status report that would have been due January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/19. (DMK) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-3015STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of the government's notice 15 , the stay in this case is lifted. The parties must submit a joint status report by February 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/31/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-2216Joint STATUS REPORT by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-26MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by March 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/26/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-2217Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-26MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file an updated joint status report by March 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/26/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-2918Joint STATUS REPORT by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-02MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file an updated joint status report by April 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/02/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-1919Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-05-07MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file an updated status report by May 14, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/07/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/07/2019)
2019-05-1420Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/14/2019)
2019-05-15MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The parties must submit a joint status report by May 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/15/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-2321Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-28MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file a joint status report by June 21, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/28/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-06-2122Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-24MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by July 22, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/24/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-2223Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-25MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by September 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/25/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-08-0624NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-09-1225Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-09-17MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit an updated joint status report by October 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/17/2019. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar