Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01366
Date Filed2018-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the Cadiz Valley Water Conservation Recovery and Storage Project. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-081COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5524668) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Kimbrell, George) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/11/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-082Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-083MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kellan Smith, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento Street, 2nd Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5524806. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-08Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmd) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-115SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2018: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd). (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-124STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 12, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice of Kellan Smith. Kellan Smith may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 12, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/27/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/27/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/25/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/25/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-267ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-098Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties 8 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by September 7, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 10, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018. (tg) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-09-079Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by October 19, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 18, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (tg) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-1610Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by November 19, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 17, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-11-1911Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by December 19, 2018, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 20, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2018. (tg) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-12-1912Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by January 28, 2019, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 19, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019. (ztg) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2019-01-2813Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by February 28, 2019, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 29, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2019. (tg) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-1114NOTICE of Change of Address by George A. Kimbrell (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-2815Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by March 28, 2019, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 1, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2019. (tg) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-2216NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. Attorney Kellan Smith terminated. (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2817Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, that if this matter has not yet been settled, the parties file, by April 26, 2019, a joint status report proposing a schedule for the filing of any motions about an award of costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 28, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-2618Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by May 23, 2019, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 29, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/23/2019. (tg) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-2319Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 05/23/2019)
2019-05-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, that the parties file, by June 24, 2019, a further joint status report with a proposed schedule for the filing of any dispositive motions, unless a joint stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 27, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/27/2019)
2019-05-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2019, unless a joint stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. (tg) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-06-2420Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-24MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) by October 4, 2019, the plaintiff Center for Food Safety shall file its motion for fees and costs, unless a joint stipulation of dismissal has been filed before that date; (2) by November 1, 2019, the defendant Department of Interior shall file its opposition; and (3) by November 22, 2019, the plaintiff shall file its reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 24, 2019. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's motions for fees and costs due by 10/4/2019; defendant's opposition due by 11/1/2019; plaintiff's reply due by 11/22/2019. (tg) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar