Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01381
Date Filed2018-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the Russian efforts to influence the 2016 election that were provided to either the Senate Foreign Relations Committee or Committee member Sen. Ben Cardin (D-MD). The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5527551) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-112LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsth) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/25/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/25/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/25/2018 (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-095NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-256ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-267ORDER. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by no later than AUGUST 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/26/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/16/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-168Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that Defendant will complete its initial searches in this matter by August 31, 2018, and will make its first production of records by September 21, 2018. The parties will meet and confer about a final production date after Defendant's initial searches are complete. The parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by no later than OCTOBER 1, 2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/17/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request. (dot) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-09-229Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the Defendant's 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ordered parties to submit a Joint Status Report on or before October 1, 2018. Defense counsel will be away from the office for a period of time and requests that the Court extend the deadline until October 11, 2018. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. The Court ORDERS parties to submit a Joint Status Report by OCTOBER 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09-24-2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2018. (kt) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-1010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-10MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report. The parties represent Defendant has completed its initial search for records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. The parties propose that Defendant complete production of non-exempt, responsive records before July 1, 2019, with rolling monthly productions on the first day of every month. The parties have also agreed that a Vaughn index will be required and will be prepared in tandem with any dispositive motions, if necessary. The parties are ORDERED to file another Joint Status Report by no later than DECEMBER 10, 2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request. The parties are further ORDERED to file additional Joint Status Reports every 60 days thereafter. The parties are also free to file Joint Status Reports between the filing deadlines if issues arise that require the Court's attention. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/10/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2018. (dot) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-12-0711Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2019-02-0612NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-0813Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-04-0914Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-06-0615Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-07-1716Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-09-0617Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-11-2318NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by William J. Chang on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney JOSHUA ROGERS (Chang, William) (Entered: 11/23/2019)
2019-12-0219Joint MOTION for Leave to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Dec 2 Joint Status Report)(Chang, William) (Entered: 12/02/2019)
2019-12-03MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 19 Joint Motion to File Status Report, Nunc Pro Tunc. The parties failed to file timely their previous status report due to a mistake on the deadline. The parties' Motion is GRANTED. The parties report that Defendant will provide Plaintiff an unsigned Vaughn index and unsigned search declaration by December 20, 2019. The parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report on JANUARY 27, 2020, indicating how the parties propose to proceed. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12-3-2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/27/2020, indicating how the parties propose to proceed. (dot) (Entered: 12/03/2019)
2019-12-0920Joint STATUS REPORT (filed pursuant to the Court's Order Granting the Parties' Join Motion for Leave to File) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Cotca, Ramona) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2020-01-2721Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-27MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report. Defendant indicates that it has completed a supplemental search and is reviewing potentially responsive records. The parties require additional time for Defendant to complete any necessary supplemental processing and to engage in discussions with Plaintiff to potentially narrow the issues for litigation. The parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by MARCH 5, 2020, setting forth recommendations to the Court for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1-27-2020. (lcckk3) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2020. (kt) (Entered: 01/28/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar