Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01383
Date Filed2018-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION
Case DescriptionThe American Immigration Lawyers Association submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the affect of wage surveys on the adjudication of H-1B visas. AILA also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AILA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5527986) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Kenney, Mary) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-112CIVIL COVER SHEET by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION re 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION.(Kenney, Mary) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/14/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-113ERRATA filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION.(Kenney, Mary) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-114REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 3 Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. Related document: 3 Amended Complaint filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Kenney, Mary) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-115Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION. (Kenney, Mary) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsth) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-126SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-217NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Karen Dellon on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRATION LAWYERS ASSOCIATION (Dellon, Leslie) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Defendants, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/26/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/25/2018.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Kenney, Mary) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-239Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-24MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's time to answer Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until September 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/24/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/26/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-09-2110Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-21MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including September 26,2018, to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/21/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2111Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-24MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including October 22, 2018, to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/21/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/22/2018. (tj) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/26/2018. (tj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-2212Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-22MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall have up to and including December 4, 2018, to file a Joint Status Report in this matter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/22/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar