Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRisk v. Internal Revenue Service et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityFt Lauderdale
Case Number0:2018cv61300
Date Filed2018-06-11
Date Closed2018-06-27
JudgeJudge Cecilia M. Altonaga
PlaintiffLinus Michael Risk
PlaintiffLinda Pauline Risk
Case DescriptionLinus Risk submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning his consent to be subject to the tax laws. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Risk filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
DefendantInternal Revenue Service John T. Arthur, Assistant IRS Counsel
DefendantV. Hayes ID #1000315823
DefendantInternal Revenue Service V. Hayes, Revenue Officer ID # 1000315823
DefendantSocial Security Administration
DefendantJP Morgan Chase Bank
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-111COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, V. Hayes. Filing fees $ 400.00 Receipt#: FLS000010598, filed by Linus Michael Risk. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ls) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-112Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ls) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-113Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 6/11/2018 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000010598 (ls) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-154ORDER dismissing 1 Complaint filed by Linus Michael Risk; Amended Complaint due by 6/21/2018. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/14/2018. (ps1) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-155AMENDED COMPLAINT against V. Hayes, Internal Revenue Service, filed by Linus Michael Risk.(ebz) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/20/2018) (drz). (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-156Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Linus Michael Risk to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: linus1949@att.net (ebz) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 4 : Amended Complaint due by 6/21/2018. (lk) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-207AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, filed by Linus Michael Risk.(ebz) Modified added Defendants on 6/21/2018 (ebz). (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-268MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Linda Pauline Risk, Linus Michael Risk. (ebz) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-279ORDER denying 8 Motion for Order to Show Cause as unintelligible. If Defendants are seeking documents from Defendants, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure govern that process; it is not accomplished by a vague motion for order to show cause. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2710ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/27/2018. (ps1) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2711ORDER DISMISSING and Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/27/2018. (ps1) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-0212MOTION for Reconsideration re 11 Order Dismissing Case by Linda Pauline Risk, Linus Michael Risk. (ebz) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-0213MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Linda Pauline Risk, Linus Michael Risk. (ebz) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff