Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01441
Date Filed2018-06-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's decision to remove 17 biosphere reserves from the UNESCO World Network of Biosphere Reserves. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSTATE DEPARTMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-181COMPLAINT against STATE DEPARTMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5540374) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration Corporate Disclosure, # 3 Summons State Department, # 4 Summons US AG, # 5 Summons US Att DC)(Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-182LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (zsth) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-18Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsth) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to STATE DEPARTMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/25/2018. (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/25/2018. (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/16/2018 (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-247Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by not later than August 25, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/24/2018. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/25/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-208ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-239NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Naomi Dinerstein on behalf of PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Dinerstein, Paula) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/24/2018) (zjf). (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-2310NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. Attorney Adam Scott Carlesco terminated. (Carlesco, Adam) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-2311ORDER directing the parties to propose a briefing schedule. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/23/2018. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall confer and submit by 9/21/2018 a proposed briefing schedule or, separate proposals in the event the parties cannot agree, for the filing of dispositive motions. (jth) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' shall submit a joint status report by not later than October 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/21/2018. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2113ERRATA by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2018. (jth) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-3114Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report by not later than December 6, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/1/18. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2018. (dot) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar