Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01446
Date Filed2018-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for text messages sent between Assistant Attorney General for Legislative Affairs Peter Kadzik and FBI agent Peter Strzok. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5541609) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to Dept of Justice, # 4 Summons to US Attorney, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-164ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/16/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 4 Notice of Appearance was entered in error (WRONG CASE) and counsel will not refile said pleading. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-175NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Wolfson Young on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-276ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Young, Danielle) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-02MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than September 1, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/2/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 9/1/2018. (mac) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-297Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-09-04MINUTE ORDER in view of 7 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than September 14, 2018 recommending steps for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/4/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2018. (mac) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-148Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-17MINUTE ORDER in view of 8 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by no later than January 11, 2019 recommending steps for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/17/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/11/2019. (mac) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-189NOTICE of Change of Address by Danielle Wolfson Young (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar