Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01448
Date Filed2018-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning former FBI Director James Comey's draft statement closing its investigation of Hillary Clinton's email server. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and divided it into two separate requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5542449) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-192LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-193NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-20Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-204SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-035ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/25/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/25/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/2/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/25/2018 (Orfanedes, Paul) Modified on 7/5/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-05NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to porfanedes@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please with correct case number Modified on 7/12/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-256ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Layton, Elisabeth) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by August 9, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/26/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/9/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-097Joint STATUS REPORT And Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Layton, Elisabeth) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a further joint status report by October 17, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/10/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/17/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-10-178Joint STATUS REPORT And Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Layton, Elisabeth) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule and ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff shall inform Defendant what aspects of the withholdings and the search for responsive records it intends to challenge by January 31, 2019; 2) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment and any Vaughn index or declaration by February 13, 2019; 3) Plaintiff shall its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion by March 13, 2019; 4) Defendant shall file its Reply in support of its Motion and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion by April 12, 2019; and 5) Plaintiff shall file its Reply in support of its Cross-Motion by April 26, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/18/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 2/13/2019. Plaintiff shall inform Defendant what aspects of the withholdings and the search for responsive records it intends to challenge due by 1/31/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 2/13/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/13/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/12/2019. Replies due by 4/26/2019. (nbn) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar