Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREINHARD v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01449
Date Filed2018-06-19
Date Closed2019-07-11
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJOSHUA L. REINHARD
Case DescriptionJoshua Reinhard submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security. His first FOIA request asked for records concerning his involuntary separation from the Coast Guard. The agency did not respond to his request. His second FOIA request asked for the command climate survey conducted for the Coast Guard District in New Orleans. The agency told Reinhard that there were 1,000 pages responsive to his request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Reinhard filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [19]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-191COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5543130) filed by JOSHUA L. REINHARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-202ERRATA re 1 Complaint filed by JOSHUA L. REINHARD.(Montalvo, Eric) Modified on 7/3/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-08-064NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-09-045ANSWER to Corrected Complaint 2 by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Taaffe, Damon); Modified to add link on 9/5/2018 (tth). (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 18, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/4/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/18/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-196Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 6 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by November 19, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/19/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-11-197Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and Briefing Schedule and ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by December 20, 2018; 2) Plaintiff shall file his cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion by January 18, 2019; 3) Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by February 1, 2019; and 4) Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion by February 8, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/19/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 12/20/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/18/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/1/2019. Replies due by 2/8/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-198MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Houck Decl. with Exhibits)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2019-01-119Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to by JOSHUA L. REINHARD (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Extension of Time and ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff shall file his cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion by January 25, 2019; 2) Defendant shall file its opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply in support of its motion by February 8, 2019; and 3) Plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion by February 15, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/15/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/25/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/8/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/15/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-2510RESPONSE re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOSHUA L. REINHARD. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Facts Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-2511Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOSHUA L. REINHARD (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Facts Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-3112Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant's Consent 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED; 2) Defendant shall file its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and its Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by February 22, 2019; and 3) Plaintiff shall file his Reply in support of his Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by March 1, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/31/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/22/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/1/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-1513NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-2214Memorandum in opposition to re 11 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Jesse Houck and updated Vaughn index)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-2215REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jesse Houck and updated Vaughn index)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-0116REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOSHUA L. REINHARD. (Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall produce to the Court for in camera review by March 11, 2019, clean and redacted copies of the 16 documents challenged in Plaintiff's 16 Reply. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/5/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines: In-Camera Submission due by 3/11/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-1117NOTICE of In Camera Submission by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-07-1118ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Defendant's 8 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; (2) Plaintiff's 11 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; (3) Defendant may withhold all disputed documents except those stamped USCG 80, 81, 243, 540-97, 695, and 743-75, which must be turned over to Plaintiff; and (4) Judgment is ENTERED in favor of each side in part consistent with the Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/11/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-1119MEMORANDUM OPINION re 18 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/11/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-2320Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file a motion for Attorneys Fees by JOSHUA L. REINHARD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-23MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 20 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that any motion for attorney fees shall be filed by August 26, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/23/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar