Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigrant Justice Center v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv04244
Date Filed2018-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Robert M. Dow, Jr
PlaintiffNational Immigrant Justice Center
Case DescriptionThe National Immigrant Justice Center submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning contracts with the agency to run detention centers. NIJC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told NIJC that it was taking a 10-day extension. The agency also told NIJC that it placed the NIJC in the a non-commercial requester category for fee purposes. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NIJC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-191COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by National Immigrant Justice Center; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14602538. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-192CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (daj, ) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-203ENTERED in error. Modified on 6/21/2018 (ks, ). (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-214NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ks, ) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-295MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 7/27/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-116ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Samuel Fifer (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-117ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Stacey Elizabeth Petrek (Petrek, Stacey) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-13SUMMONS Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, and U.S. Attorney, (yt) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-168ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by William Edward Walsh (Walsh, William) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16SUMMONS Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Attorney General (pj, ) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-189NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by National Immigrant Justice Center (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-1910DESIGNATION of Jimmy Lorenzo Arce as U.S. Attorney for Defendants United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-2411STATUS Report (Joint) by National Immigrant Justice Center (Walsh, William) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-2712MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 10/23/2018 at 9:00 a.m. As discussed on the record, discovery to be produced on a rolling basis. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-0113MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center to consolidate cases Joint Motion for Consolidation (Walsh, William) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0114NOTICE of Motion by William Edward Walsh for presentment of motion to consolidate cases 13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/7/2018 at 10:00 AM. (Walsh, William) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0615SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Department of Homeland Security served on 7/26/2018, answer due 9/24/2018 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-0616SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/19/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-0717MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Joint motion for consolidation of Civil Action No. 1:18-cv-004247, currently assigned to the Hon. Sara L. Ellis 13 is granted. The cases will be consolidated for all purposes and all further filing will be made in 18-cv-4244. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-2218MOTION by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center for leave to file amended complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Walsh, William) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2219NOTICE of Motion by William Edward Walsh for presentment of motion for leave to file 18 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/4/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Walsh, William) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2220Corrected NOTICE of Motion by William Edward Walsh for presentment of motion for leave to file 18 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/28/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Walsh, William) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2721MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr:Motion hearing stricken. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint 18 is granted, to be filed upon receipt of this order.Mailed notice (clw, ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-2722AMENDED complaint by National Immigrant Justice Center against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a, # 2 Exhibit b, # 3 Exhibit c, # 4 Exhibit d, # 5 Exhibit e, # 6 Exhibit f)(Walsh, William) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-2123ANSWER to amended complaint by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-2224NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center. (Walsh, William) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-2325MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 12/20/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Initial disclosures with notice to the court are modified as discussed on the record in open court. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar