Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigrant Justice Center v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv04247
Date Filed2018-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Robert M. Dow, Jr
PlaintiffNational Immigrant Justice Center
Case DescriptionThe National Immigrant Justice Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning enforcement and removal inspections for facilities housing more than 50 non-citizens in the custody of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. NIJC indicated that its request was to be considered ongoing. NIJC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked a 10-day extension. The agency also told NIJC that it was placed in non-commercial requester category for purposes of fees. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NIJC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-191COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by National Immigrant Justice Center; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14602937. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-192CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (daj, ) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-203NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-054MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/4/2018 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 8/28/2018. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-115ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Samuel Fifer (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-116ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by Stacey Elizabeth Petrek (Petrek, Stacey) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-13SUMMONS Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, and U.S. Attorney(yt) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-167ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff National Immigrant Justice Center by William Edward Walsh (Walsh, William) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16SUMMONS Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Attorney General (pj, ) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-188NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by National Immigrant Justice Center (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-08-069SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Department of Homeland Security served on 7/26/2018, answer due 9/24/2018 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-0610SUMMONS Returned Executed by National Immigrant Justice Center as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/19/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 (Fifer, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-0911EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr for all further proceedings, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/9/2018.(ph, ) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-09-0412MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Matter having been reassigned, status hearing set for 9/4/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar