Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOOD FOOD INSTITUTE v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01453
Date Filed2018-06-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffGOOD FOOD INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Good Food Institute submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning an interagency working group focused on clean meat. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Good Food Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-201COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5544342) filed by GOOD FOOD INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Barrella, Nigel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/20/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOOD FOOD INSTITUTE (Barrella, Nigel) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsth) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-203SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-254ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 06/25/2018. (DM) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-07-255ANSWER to Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-266ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by no later than AUGUST 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/26/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/16/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-137NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-168Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that Defendant is still in the process of reviewing and producing records responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Defendant estimates that it will complete its production prior to January 31, 2019. The parties further represent that, at this time, neither party anticipates filing dispositive motions. The parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by no later than OCTOBER 15, 2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request and whether the parties can address any remaining issues without further litigation. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/17/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request and whether the parties can address any remaining issues without further litigation. (zot) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-10-159Joint STATUS REPORT by GOOD FOOD INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barrella, Nigel) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-15MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that the Defendant has disclosed numerous documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request. Defendant represents that it has completed its search and will complete production prior to January 31, 2019. Neither party reports that it anticipates the need to file dispositive motions. The parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by no later than JANUARY 31, 2019, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request and whether the parties can address any remaining issues without further litigation. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/15/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2019, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request and whether the parties can address any remaining issues without further litigation. (dot) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar