Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleChapman v. Office of Management and Budget
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv04269
Date Filed2018-06-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable John J. Tharp, Jr
PlaintiffMatthew Chapman
Case DescriptionMatthew Chapman submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning metadata contained in emails sent to extensions ending in "omb.eop.gov" during January 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but rejected it as being too broad. Chapman then narrowed his request to a seven-day time frame. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Chapman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantOffice of Management and Budget
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-201COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Chapman; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14607304. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-202CIVIL Cover Sheet (Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-203ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Chapman by Daniel E Massoglia (Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (ec, ) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-20SUMMONS Issued as to Office of Management and Budget, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ec, ) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-214NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-215ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Chapman by Mariana Karampelas (Karampelas, Mariana) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-086SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Chapman as to Office of Management and Budget served on 6/27/2018, answer due 8/27/2018, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Chapman as to Office of Management and Budget on 6/27/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Return of Service on U.S. Attorney of ND IL, # 2 Affidavit Return of Service on U.S. Attorney General)(Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 07/08/2018)
2018-07-097MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 9/12/18 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 9/5/18. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-198DESIGNATION of Jimmy Lorenzo Arce as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Office of Management and Budget (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-08-229MOTION by Defendant Office of Management and Budget for extension of time Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Answer (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2210NOTICE of Motion by Jimmy Lorenzo Arce for presentment of extension of time 9 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/28/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2311MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time 9 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The government's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is now 9/28/17. The initial status conference set for 9/12/18 is reset to 10/10/18 at 9:00 a.m. The initial status report is now due 10/3/18. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-2812MOTION by Defendant Office of Management and Budget for extension of time to file answer regarding order on motion for extension of time,, terminate hearings,, set/reset hearings, 11 (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-09-2813NOTICE of Motion by Jimmy Lorenzo Arce for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 12 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/4/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-0114MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant's motion to extend the deadline to file an answer 12 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is now 10/5/18. The initial status conference set for 10/10/18 is reset to 10/17/18 at 9:00 a.m. The initial status report is now due 10/10/18. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-0515ANSWER to Complaint by Office of Management and Budget(Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-0916STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Matthew Chapman (Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-1717MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 2/21/19 at 9:00 a.m. to set a possible expert discovery schedule. Defendant did not appear for today's hearing. This case is under the MIDP pilot program. Once the parties have complied with MIDP, formal discovery may be served. Fact discovery cut-off set on 2/22/19. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-11-0518NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Matthew Chapman. (Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-2819Plaintiff's Motion to Compel MIDPP Disclosures NOTICE of Motion by Daniel E Massoglia for presentment of before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/6/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-2820MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Chapman to compel MIDPP Responses (Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-0321RESPONSE by Office of Management and Budget to MOTION by Plaintiff Matthew Chapman to compel MIDPP Responses 20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-0422REPLY by Matthew Chapman to response to motion 21 to Compel MIDPP Responses (Massoglia, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0623MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to compel 20 is granted in part. Defendant is relieved from its MIDP obligations. Plaintiff may proceed to issue discovery and leave will be granted upon request for reasonable additional interrogatories, if needed. Fact discovery cut-off is extended to 4/15/19. Status hearing scheduled for 2/21/19 remains in effect. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-2624GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
2019-01-0825AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-2826GENERAL ORDER 19-0004: RESETTING OF DEADLINES IN CIVIL MATTERS INVOLVING THE UNITED STATES AS A PARTY. IT APPEARING THAT as a result of the partial federal government shutdown, this Court amended General Order 18-0028 suspending as of December 21, 2018, all civil litigation in which the United States of America, its agencies, its officers, or employees were parties, with the stated intention of clarifying schedules in such cases upon the expiration of the lapse in appropriations; and IT FURTHER APPEARING THAT appropriations having been restored to fund the Department of Justice and other Executive Branch agencies, with employees beginning to report for work beginning on January 28, 2019; accordingly IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay entered by General Order 18-0028 is hereby lifted, and any and all deadlines in the affected civil litigation (whether established by order, rule, or agreement.), including but not limited to any scheduled discovery and pleading dates, are extended by 42 days. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/28/2019: Mailed notice. (mgw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2927MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Notwithstanding the Court's General Order 19-0004, the status hearing set for 2/21/19 remains as scheduled. The Court will determine whether the fact discovery deadline will be adjusted at that hearing. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar