Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01466
Date Filed2018-06-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice. The first FOIA request was submitted to the Office of the Attorney General and asked for records concerning communications between Deputy Attorney General Rod Rosenstein and Special Counsel Robert Mueller pertaining to the raid on Michael Cohen's office and hotel room. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The second FOIA request was submitted to the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys and asked for records concerning the search warrant for the raid on Cohen's office and hotel room. Judicial Watch submitted a third request to EOUSA for records concerning communications between Rosenstein and the U.S. Attorney for the Southern District of New York pertaining to the Cohen raid. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5546780) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-212LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-21Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zmd) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-07-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/29/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/29/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/29/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/29/2018 (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-305ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/30/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/13/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-316Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to submit proposed joint schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-14MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' joint status report proposing a schedule for briefing and production shall now be due by August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/14/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/27/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-227Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file joint status report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-23MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Joint Status Report. The joint status report is now due on or before September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/23/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-078Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 September 7, 2018 joint status report, the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before November 2, 2018, updating the Court on the status of the case and proposing a briefing schedule for any anticipated dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/7/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-269NOTICE of Change of Address by Marsha Stelson Edney (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-11-0210Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Edney, Marsha) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar