Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleColton v. Dubois Wyoming et al
DistrictDistrict of Wyoming
CityCheyenne
Case Number2:2018cv00097
Date Filed2018-06-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Alan B Johnson
PlaintiffCraig Colton
Case DescriptionCraig Cotton filed suit against the Town of Dubois, Wyoming to force the town to approve his application to build an airpark there. Although Cotton cites FOIA at the end of his complaint, this is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA mentioned only tangentially

DefendantDubois Wyoming
DefendantTwila Blakeman individually
also known as Dubois Mayor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-211COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief and Violation of "Freedom of Information Act" and Municipal Fiscal Procedures (two summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #Chy029023.), filed by Craig Colton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Envelope, # 3 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-302NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Thompson on behalf of Twila Blakeman, Dubois Wyoming (Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-303MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants Twila Blakeman, Dubois Wyoming. (Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-304BRIEF In Support re 3 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Twila Blakeman, Dubois Wyoming. (Thompson, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-135SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Colton. All Defendants served on 07/16/18. (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-136OPPOSITION to 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Craig Colton. (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-137BRIEF in Opposition re 3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Craig Colton. (Court Staff, sth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar