Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv03756
Date Filed2018-06-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
Case DescriptionPatrick Michels, a reporter for the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Service's Administration for Children and Families for records concerning policies pertaining to housing unaccompanied minors. Michels asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Michels and CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-251COMPLAINT against United States Department of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12462366.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 6/25/2018) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-252Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 6/25/2018) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-253Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 6/25/2018) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-254Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/9/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-265CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR).. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-276Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-277Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-288CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Center for Investigative Reporting (CIR) (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 6/28/2018) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-309STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-0710STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 8/7/2018) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar