Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFOOD & WATER WATCH INC. v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01497
Date Filed2018-06-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFOOD & WATER WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionFood & Water Watch submitted a FOIA request for records concerning contracts or agreements between the agency and Allan Blutstein, who operated America Rising, a conservative campaign-research group, and Definers Public Affairs, a group affiliated with America Rising which had recently been awarded a $120,000 no-bid contract for monitoring media coverage of the agency. The contract was subsequently cancelled after being revealed in the media. Food & Water Watch also requested a fee waiver, which was granted. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Food & Water Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-251COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5552933) filed by FOOD AND WATER WATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. EPA, # 3 Summons for U.S. Atty's Office for DC, # 4 Summons for U.S. Atty General)(Corrigan, Zachary) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/27/2018) (zmd) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-252LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FOOD & WATER WATCH (Corrigan, Zachary) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/27/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-25Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 7/2/2018 (Corrigan, Zachary) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/05/2018. (Corrigan, Zachary) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/3/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/2/2018. (Corrigan, Zachary) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-08-027NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-028ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 6, 2018. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-239Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-23MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 9 Joint Motion to Extend. It is ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint status report on or before September 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 23, 2018. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-09-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before November 12, 2018 and every 60 days thereafter until the defendant has finished processing the plaintiff's FOIA request. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 17, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-11-0911Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar