Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSierra Club et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv03799
Date Filed2018-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley
PlaintiffSierra Club
PlaintiffFriends of the Earth
Case DescriptionThe Sierra Club and Friends of the Earth submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior and the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning the processing of FOIA requests. Neither agency initially acknowledged receipt of the requests, but both agencies did acknowledge receipt of the requests after the Sierra Club and Friends of the Earth contacted them to check on their status. However, after hearing nothing further from either agency, the Sierra Club and Friends of the Earth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of the Interior
DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-261COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12464660.). Filed bySierra Club, Friends of the Earth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons, # 9 Attachment to Summons)(Chi, Yuting) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-262Certificate of Interested Entities by Friends of the Earth, Sierra Club (Chi, Yuting) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-263MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Cmar ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12464821.) filed by Friends of the Earth, Sierra Club. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Attachment 1 - CGS)(Cmar, Thomas) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-264Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/10/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-275Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-276Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-107CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Friends of the Earth, Sierra Club.. (Chi, Yuting) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-108ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas Cmar. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-169NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne L. Bloch (Bloch, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/16/2018) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-1910CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Friends of the Earth, Sierra Club (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chi, Yuting) (Filed on 7/19/2018) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-3011STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-3012CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/13/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-1313CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior.. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 8/13/2018) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-2914Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 8/29/2018) Modified on 8/29/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-2915STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Initial Case Management Conference and Rule 26(a) and (f) Requirements filed by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-3016ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 15 Stipulation re Initial Case Management Conference and Rule 26(a) and (f) Requirements. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 11/8/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-10-0217ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/2/2018) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-1818ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/18/2018) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1819ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Sierra Club and counsel (Chi, Yuting) (Filed on 10/18/2018) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1820ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Friends of the Earth and counsel (Chi, Yuting) (Filed on 10/18/2018) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-11-0121JOINT STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/1/2018) Modified on 11/2/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0522ORDER granting 21 JOINT REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE filed by United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/5/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2019. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 1/24/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar