Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01508
Date Filed2018-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted FOIA requests to OMB and the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the Internet browsing histories of OMB Director Mick Mulvaney and Agriculture Secretary Sonny Perdue. COA also requested a fee waiver and inclusion in the news media fee category. OMB acknowledged receipt of the request. USDA told COA that it did not maintain records of employees' Internet browsing history. COA filed an administrative appeal of that decision, which was upheld on appeal. Having heard nothing further from OMB, COA filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Agency Record, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantWHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-261COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5554497) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons OMB, # 10 Summons USDA, # 11 Summons US Att'y Gen., # 12 Summons Civil Process Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-262Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-263NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-27Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-274SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 7/2/2018 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 7/2/2018 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/02/2018. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-098ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/2/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/1/2018. (Mulvey, Ryan) Modified on 7/13/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-099RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/5/2018. (ztd) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 8 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and refiled said pleading as docket entry no. 9 . (ztd) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff