Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEQUITY FORWARD v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01509
Date Filed2018-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffEQUITY FORWARD
Case DescriptionEquity Forward submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for travel and appointment records for several HHS officials, particularly at the Administration for Children and Families. The agency acknowledged receipt of Equity Forward's requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Equity Forward filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5554643) filed by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-262LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUITY FORWARD (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-27Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/28/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/28/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/2/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 7/2/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-305NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-306ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by August 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/30/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-167Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by September 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/17/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-09-188Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by October 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/20/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-189Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by November 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/19/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-2910Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-29MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/29/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2019-01-0311MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline set forth in the Court's Minute Order of November 29, 2018, to submit a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, is extended to January 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/4/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-24MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the deadline set forth in the Court's Minute Order of January 4, 2019, to submit a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, is extended to March 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/24/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER denying Defendant's 11 Motion to Stay. In light of the restoration of funding to the Department of Justice, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/29/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-03-0412Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than April 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/4/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-04-0313Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03In light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/3/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-05-0314Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-06MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/6/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-06-1415Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-17MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by July 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/17/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-07-1516Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar