Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01523
Date Filed2018-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed, Inc. submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Service Ombudsman Julie Kirchner's work activities. The agency rejected Buzzfeed's request as too broad. Buzzfeed filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Buzzfeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5556205) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-262NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsth) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-094NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/3/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/05/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/5/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/4/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-118NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff