Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEdwards v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Kansas
CityKansas City
Case Number2:2018cv02341
Date Filed2018-06-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Daniel D. Crabtree
PlaintiffWilliam Edwards
Case DescriptionWilliam Edwards submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning a potential briefing of electors after the 2016 election. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Edwards filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-251COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by William Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Envelope)(tvn) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-252CIVIL COVER SHEET re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff William Edwards. (tvn) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-253DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff William Edwards - trial to be held in Kansas City. (tvn) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number T4631011903. (tvn) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tvn) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-08-204ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Justice.(Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-275INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/5/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 8/27/18.Mailed to pro se party William Edwards by regular mail. (ss) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-276MOTION for Judgment (Titled: Motion Pursuant to FRCP 12c) by Plaintiff William Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (ydm) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-09-187MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 6 MOTION for Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Justice (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-18MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 6 MOTION for Judgment . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-198NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) On the court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/18 is RESCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2018 at 11:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. A copy of this notice was sent to William Edwards by regular mail.(ss) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-199ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 6 MOTION for Judgment. Response deadline extended to 10/26/2018. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 09/19/2018. Mailed to pro se party William Edwards by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-2010SUPPLEMENT to 6 MOTION for Judgment by Plaintiff William Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Letter) (ydm) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-10-0211MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference or, in the Alternative, to Cancel Scheduling Conference by Defendant United States Department of Justice (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-0212ORDER expediting briefing deadlines regarding 11 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Any response is due October 9, 2018. Any reply is due October 11, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/2/2018. Mailed to pro se party by regular and certified mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-02NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 12 Order on Motion to Continue, mailed to William Edwards on 10/2/2018 by regular and certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 70180680000181740311. (ydm) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-0913RESPONSE by Plaintiff William Edwards (Titled-Brief in Opposition to the FBI'S Request To Continue or Cancel The Scheduling Conference) re 11 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference or, in the Alternative, to Cancel Scheduling Conference. (ydm) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-1014REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant United States Department of Justice re: 11 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference or, in the Alternative, to Cancel Scheduling Conference (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-1115ORDER granting 11 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the motion is granted and the October 18, 2018 scheduling conference is canceled. Within ten days of a ruling on the motion for judgment, if the case remains pending, the parties are ordered to submit their planning-meeting report to the undersigned's chambers. The court will then re-set the scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/11/2018. Mailed to pro se party William Edwards by regular mail. (ydm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-1116NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Scheduling Conference on October 18,2018 is cancelled per 15 Order. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-2617Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Justice (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2918MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Justice (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-2919MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Justice (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, Declaration of Michael G. Seidel, # 2 Attachment 2, Notice to Pro Se Litigant)(Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-2920RESPONSE by Defendant United States Department of Justice re 6 MOTION for Judgment (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-30MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 17 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(mig) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-3021ORDER granting 17 Motion for a Continuance. Defendant's deadline to file a Motion for Summary Judgment and a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment (Doc. 6) is extended to 10/29/2018. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 10/30/2018. Mailed to pro se party William Edwards by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-0122MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff William Edwards. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (ydm) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0823RETURN Mail received re 12 Order on Motion to Continue addressed to William Edwards. Not Remailed. (ydm) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar