Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL v. U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01531
Date Filed2018-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL
Case DescriptionThe American Immigration Council submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the processing and treatment of non-citizens arriving at the U.S.-Mexico border. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
245 Murray Lane S.W.
Washington, DC 20528
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-271COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5558276) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D1, # 5 Exhibit D2, # 6 Exhibit E1, # 7 Exhibit E2, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H1, # 11 Exhibit H2, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons US Customs & Border Protection, # 14 Summons US Department of Homeland Security, # 15 Summons US Immigration Customs Enforcement)(Qian, Ni) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-272Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. (Qian, Ni) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-273MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John F. Walsh, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 1225 Seventeenth St. Suite 2600 Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - 720 274 3154. Fax No. - (720) 274-3133 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5558458. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Walsh in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Qian, Ni) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-274WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO ENTRY 7 ..... MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel Weiner Cohen, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- Rachel.Cohen@wilmerhale.com. Phone No. - 202 663 6068. Fax No. - (202) 663-6363 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5558596. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachel W. Cohen in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Qian, Ni) Modified on 7/27/2018 (zjf). (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-275NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Creighton on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Creighton, Emily) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-27Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsth) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-286SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-28SUMMONS Not Issued as to US Attorney and US Attorney General. (zsth) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-257NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL re 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rachel Weiner Cohen, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- Rachel.Cohen@wilmerhale.com. Phone No. - 202 663 6068. Fax No. - (202) 663-6363 Filing fee & (Qian, Ni) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-308NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-039RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/5/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Executed as to the US Department of Homeland Security, # 2 Summons Executed as to US Customs& Border Protection, # 3 Affidavit of Service as to US Attorney General Jeff Sessions, # 4 Affidavit of Service as to US Attorney's Office - District of DC)(Qian, Ni) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-0310Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-0311RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/3/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/3/2018; U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 7/2/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/05/2018. (See Docket Entry 9 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-06NOTICE OF ERROR re 9 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to Ni.Qian@wilmerhale.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. DO NOT REFILE - Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of their filing(s) (zjf, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-0812ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint ; Responses due by 8/22/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/7/18. (lsj) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-1613NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Walsh on behalf of AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Walsh, John) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-2214ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/21/18. (lsj) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2215ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2916ORDER: Government shall produce a Vaughn index with a supporting motion to dismiss or motion for summary judgment, as appropriate, within 30 days of this date (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/28/18. (lcrcl3) (Main Document 16 replaced on 8/29/2018) (zlsj). (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index with supporting Dispositive Motions or Summary Judgment motions due by 9/28/2018. (lsj) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-09-2117Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 16 Scheduling Order, by U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2718MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher James Asta, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, 20006. Phone No. - 202-663-6332. Fax No. - (202) 663-6363 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5709861. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christopher Asta, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, John) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-2719MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David P. Yin, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, 20006. Phone No. - 202-663-6677. Fax No. - (202) 663-6363 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5710071. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David P. Yin, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, John) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-0320NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL. Attorney Ni Qian terminated. (Qian, Ni) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-0521ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/05/2018. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-0522ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/05/2018. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-0523ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay proceedings until October 15, 2018. The Court further ORDERS the parties to file a proposed schedule for further proceedings on or before October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/05/2018. (lcrcl3) Modified on 10/9/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-1524Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Schedule for Further Proceedings by U.S. CUSTOMS & BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION & CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1725ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties shall file a proposed schedule by 10/19/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/17/18. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
2018-10-1926Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order), by AMERICAN IMMIGRATION COUNCIL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, John) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar