Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUSLIM ADVOCATES et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01546
Date Filed2018-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffMUSLIM ADVOCATES
PlaintiffCENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS
Case DescriptionMuslim Advocates and the Center for Constitutional Rights submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the waiver provisions of the Trump administration's enhanced vetting policies. Muslim Advocates and CCR also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. DHS granted the organizations' expedited processing and fee waiver requests. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services denied the organizations' request for expedited processing, but granted their request for a fee waiver. U.S. Customs and Border Protection denied the organizations' requests for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The Department of State did not acknowledge the organizations' request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Muslim Advocates and CCR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-281CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES, CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of related case form)(Shebaya, Sirine). (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-282COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5560468) filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES, CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS. (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-283REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES,CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS .(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-284ERRATA Complaint with exhibits by MUSLIM ADVOCATES, CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-295NOTICE of Appearance by Sirine Shebaya on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-296NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, MUSLIM ADVOCATES. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-2080. (zmd) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, (zmd) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-297REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by MUSLIM ADVOCATES.(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-098NOTICE of Appearance by Johnathan James Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-109SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (ztd) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1110SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-1311MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nimra Azmi, :Firm- Muslim Advocates, :Address- PO Box 66408, Washington DC 20035. Phone No. - (202) 897-2622. Fax No. - (202) 508-1007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5586438. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1412Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, MUSLIM ADVOCATES. (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 07/14/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER: Granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nimra H. Azmi may be heard in open court on behalf Plaintiffs, but may not file papers in this court. See Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar AND the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court."). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/18/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-2313RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 7/17/2018; UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/17/2018; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/17/2018; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/16/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/16/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/15/2018.) (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-1414NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of All Defendants (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-1415MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-1516RESPONSE re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, MUSLIM ADVOCATES. (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting Motion 15 for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by September 5, 2018. Future requests for the extension of any deadline by any party (or the parties jointly) must be made at least 48 hours prior to expiration of the deadline. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/17/18. (DJS) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/5/2018. (tb) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-2217MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Baher Azmy, :Firm- Center for Constitutional Rights, :Address- 666 Broadway, 7th Floor, New York, NY 10012. Phone No. - 212-614-6427. Fax No. - 212-614-6422 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5653118. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Baher Azmy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2218MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Diala Shamas, :Firm- Center for Constitutional Rights, :Address- 666 Broadway, 7th Floor, New York, NY 10012. Phone No. - 212-614-6426. Fax No. - 212-614-6422 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5653192. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS, MUSLIM ADVOCATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diala Shamas, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-2219NOTICE of Change of Address by Johnathan James Smith (Smith, Johnathan) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-24MINUTE ORDER: Granting 17 18 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Baher Azmy and Diala Shamas are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/24/18. (DJS) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-09-0520ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order by 11/19/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/24/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar