Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01550
Date Filed2018-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold and Buzzfeed, Inc. submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning emails and work activities for Brian Hook and Margaret Peterlin. Leopold also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Leopold's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold and Buzzfeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5562157) filed by Jason Leopold, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-282NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., Jason Leopold (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-29Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-114NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lynn Schafer on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Schafer, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/9/2018 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/9/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/9/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/8/2018. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-08-068MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-069RESPONSE re 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-09MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by September 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/9/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/8/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-09-1010ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-14MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by September 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/14/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 9/28/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/28/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-2811STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/1/2018) (ztd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/1/2018) (ztd). Modified on 10/1/2018 to correct add correct initials of Judge (ztd). (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an updated joint status report by October 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/1/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-3012Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an updated joint status report by November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/1/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-2913MOTION for Extension of Time to file updated Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-29MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their updated joint status report on or before December 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/29/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-0714Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an updated joint status report by January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/12/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar