Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01561
Date Filed2018-06-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffWILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION
Case DescriptionThe Wild Horse Freedom Federation submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning bait trapping, water trapping, or bait/water trapping of wild horses and burros. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Federation contacted the agency several times inquiring about the status of its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Federation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-291COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5565040) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-292REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE (3) filed by WILD HORSE FREEDOM FEDERATION.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-234NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-065NOTICE of Appearance by C. Peter Sorenson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-216Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-22MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/22/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/13/2018, (tj) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-09-137WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 9/13/2018.....ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Johnson, Wyneva) Modified on 9/21/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-13MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by September 27, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/13/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-138NOTICE to Court of Withdrawl of Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 7) by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT re 7 Answer to Complaint (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-139Joint MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-1310ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-14MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Motion to Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's September 13, 2018 Minute Order is VACATED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed in full until October 15, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report informing the Court of whether a continuation of the stay is appropriate on or before October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/14/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/15/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-10-0111Consent MOTION to Stay of Proceedings to Allow for the Produciton of Records by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-01MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay: Upon consideration of 11 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed in full until November 5, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before November 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/1/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-11-1312Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report updating the Court as to the status of this case on or before December 4, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/13/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar