Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMohammad v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Jose
Case Number5:2018cv04009
Date Filed2018-07-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Nathanael M. Cousins
PlaintiffWasim Mohammad
Case DescriptionWasim Mohammed submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the 2015-2016 agency's investigation into the death of Mohammed's son. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Mohammed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-031COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12485820.). Filed byWasim Mohammad. (Hostetter, Mark) (Filed on 7/3/2018) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-032Proposed Summons. (Hostetter, Mark) (Filed on 7/3/2018) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-033Civil Cover Sheet by Wasim Mohammad . (Hostetter, Mark) (Filed on 7/3/2018) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-054Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/19/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-055Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-056Summons Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-107CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wasim Mohammad.. (Hostetter, Mark) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-08-028Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint for Injunctive Relief byFederal Bureau of Investigation. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-029CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDIN GConsent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge BY 8/16/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-08-0310CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Bureau of Investigation.. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 8/3/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar