Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01578
Date Filed2018-07-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning the implementation of the Agricultural Marketing Act of 1946, which regulates labeling for bio- or genetically-engineered foods. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Food Safety filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5570079) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Kimbrell, George) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/6/2018) (zjd). (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-032Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-033MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kellan Smith, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento Street, 2nd Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5570136. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-06Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zjd) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-064SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-16MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kellan Smith. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/16/2018. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-205RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/11/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/10/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07-16-2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 7/11/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-106NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-107ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by August 27, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/13/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/27/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar