Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01597
Date Filed2018-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Federal Emergency Management Agency for records concerning after-action reports pertaining to contractor work in Puerto Rico in the aftermath of Hurricane Maria. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-051COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5571905) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-06Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zjd) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-234NOTICE of Proof of Service by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-135ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY.(Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-246STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-08-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 6 Defendant's Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a proposed production schedule on or before September 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 28, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Production Schedule due by 9/14/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-09-147Joint STATUS REPORT & Proposed Production Schedule by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-10-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and Proposed Production Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall review 500 pages of potentially responsive records per month. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall make an initial production to the plaintiff on or before October 19, 2018. It is further ORDERED that on or before November 13, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of their progress toward resolving this case and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 3, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2018 (hs) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-11-138NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Sherri L. Morgan (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-139Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-12-03MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before January 8, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of their progress toward resolving this case and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 3, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/8/2019. (gdf) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2019-01-0410Unopposed MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion To Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the government seeks to vacate the impending deadlines in this case. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the impending deadlines in this case are VACATED pending further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 28, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding how this case shall proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 7, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar