Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJARVIS v. COMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2017cv01813
Date Filed2017-09-01
Date Closed2018-04-23
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffDEREK N. JARVIS
DefendantCOMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-09-01Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/28/2017. (jd) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-011COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION filed by DEREK N. JARVIS.(jd) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-09-012MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEREK N. JARVIS (jd) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-053FIAT ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DEREK N. JARVIS. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/5/2017. (jd) (Entered: 10/13/2017)
2017-10-05Case Reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jd) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-164STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/16/17. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
2017-10-195Summons (2) Issued as to COMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (jf) (jf). (Entered: 10/20/2017)
2017-12-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/06/2017. (jf) (Entered: 12/11/2017)
2017-12-187NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2017-12-208MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by COMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
2018-01-02MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 8 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its response to the Complaint is due by January 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/2/18. (ms) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response due by 1/31/2018. (mac) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-309Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint, by COMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-01-31MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed 9 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by 2/14/2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/31/18. (ms) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 2/14/2018. (mac) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-1210MOTION to Dismiss by COMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit No. 1, # 3 Exhibit No. 2, # 4 Exhibit No. 3, # 5 Exhibit No. 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-1411Order advising plaintiff to respond by 3/14/2018 to the 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by the COMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/14/18. (ms) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response To Motion To Dismiss due by 3/14/2018. (mac) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
2018-02-2312Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEREK N. JARVIS. (jf) (Entered: 02/26/2018)
2018-03-0513REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by COMMISSIONER, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. (Johnson, Wyneva) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
2018-04-2314MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/23/18. (ms) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2315ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. This is a final appealable Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/23/18. (ms) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-2316JUDGMENT in favor of defendant (Commissioner, Social Security Administration) against plaintiff (Derek N. Jarvis). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/23/18. (mac) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-3017NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 15 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 14 Memorandum & Opinion, 16 Judgment by DEREK N. JARVIS. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (jf) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-3118Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re 17 Notice of Appeal. (jf) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-01USCA Case Number 18-5170 for 17 Notice of Appeal filed by DEREK N. JARVIS. (zrdj) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar