Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROBERSON v. FBI
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01593
Date Filed2018-06-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffANTHONY ROBERSON
Case DescriptionAnthony Roberson, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a lab analysis pertaining to his conviction. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Roberson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFBI Director, Christopher Wray and Unknown Defendants
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-251COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ANTHONY ROBERSON.(ztl) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-06-252MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY ROBERSON. (ztl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2018: # 1 Attachment) (ztl). (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-06-25Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/25/18. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (ztl) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-193PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/19/18. (zsth) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-074PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTHONY ROBERSON (zsb) (zsb). (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-205ORDERED that defendant, Christopher Wray, is hereby DISMISSED as a party defendant, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall assign this action randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/17/18. (zsth) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-206ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $8.33 from Prison Account of Anthony Roberson and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/17/18. (zsth) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-08-20Case Reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zsth) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-09-217SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FBI, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-24Filing fee received: $ 350, receipt number: 4616094703. (jf) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-178RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2018. (jf) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-189RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/16/2018. (jf) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-11-1510MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FBI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1611MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FBI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-16MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 and 11 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall submit an Answer in this case on or before December 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/16/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/17/2018. (zjd) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-2912RESPONSE re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ANTHONY ROBERSON. (jf) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-1313MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FBI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-13MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file an answer no later than February 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/13/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/8/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-2614Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ANTHONY ROBERSON. (jf) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2018-12-3115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FBI served on 12/21/2018 (jf) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-1616MOTION to Appoint Counsel by ANTHONY ROBERSON (jf) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-22MINUTE ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff is not entitled to court-appointed counsel in a civil proceedings. Plaintiff offers no reason that would warrant appointing counsel at this early stage in a Freedom of Information Act case. Signed by Amit P. Mehta 1/22/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-02-0817MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by FBI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before February 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/11/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/22/2019. (gdf) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-2219MOTION to Compel by ANTHONY ROBERSON (jf) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-2518MOTION for Extension of Time to by FBI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 18 Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer. Defendant's Answer is due on or before March 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/25/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/21/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/10/2019)
2019-02-26MINUTE ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Compel. Under the present schedule, Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint no later than March 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/26/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-2120MOTION to Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment by FBI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 3/21/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-2221Order advising Plaintiff to respond by April 22, 2019 to Defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/22/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2222ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 5, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/22/2019. (lcapm2) Modified on 3/22/2019 (zjd, ). (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-22NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: 22 Order was erroneously filed. (zjd) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 4/22/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-04-0323Revised Order vacating April 22, 2019 deadline and advising Plaintiff to respond by May 13, 2019 to Defendant's 20 Motion or risk dismissal of the case. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/3/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 5/13/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-1824Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Or In The Alternative Motion For Summary Judgment filed by ANTHONY ROBERSON. (jf) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar