Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIRVIN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01594
Date Filed2018-06-26
Date Closed2018-07-30
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffMATTHEW IRVIN
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDONALD TRUMP
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Office of Public Affairs
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantMARIA CANTWELL
DefendantKEYANNA WHEELER
DefendantTIFFANY BROWN
DefendantCHRISTOPHER HENRY COSBY #20641-078
DefendantDALLAS SEYMONE #654850
DefendantCEDRIC JAMES #801800591
DefendantMATTHEW GRANT, JR. #501704155
DefendantQUINTEN WALDEN L64538
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-06-26Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 6/26/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-303MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/27/18. (ztl) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-304ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/27/18. (ztl) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar