Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKENNY v. TOMS RIVER TOWNSHIP BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityTrenton
Case Number3:2018cv11461
Date Filed2018-07-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael A. Shipp
PlaintiffFRANK J. KENNY, III
Case DescriptionFrank Kenny filed suit against Tom's River Township Board of Adjustment to force either the local, state, or federal government to inspect his residence. This is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantTOMS RIVER TOWNSHIP BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT
DefendantTOMS RIVER TOWNSHIP CODE INFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [5]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-061COMPLAINT against TOMS RIVER TOWNSHIP BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT, TOMS RIVER TOWNSHIP CODE INFORCEMENT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW036869) with JURY DEMAND, filed by FRANK J. KENNY, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jem) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-063MOTION to Keep Shed on Site Till Inspection by FRANK J. KENNY, III. (jem) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-092SUMMONS ISSUED as to TOMS RIVER TOWNSHIP BOARD OF ADJUSTMENT, TOMS RIVER TOWNSHIP CODE INFORCEMENT Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Summonses sent via USPS on 7/09/2018. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-09Set Deadlines as to 3 MOTION to Keep Shed on Site Till Inspection. Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-254CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FRANK J. KENNY, III (km) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-09-175MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 3 Motion to Keep Shed on Site Till Inspection. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/17/2018. (km) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar