Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv04105
Date Filed2018-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Northern California submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning contracts awarded to G4S and other contractors to transport individuals to San Francisco. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU of Northern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Defendant3rd party plaintiff
Floricel Liborio Ramos
Defendant3rd party plaintiff
Maria de Jesus Medina Ramirez
Defendant3rd party plaintiff
Maria Valdovinos Diaz
Defendant3rd party plaintiff
Yolanda Vallejo Medrano
DefendantG4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-101COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under the Freedom of Information Act against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12497861.). Filed byAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 7/10/2018) Modified on 7/10/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-102Proposed Summons. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-103NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Shichen Ong (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-104NOTICE of Appearance by Hayes Phillips Hyde (Hyde, Hayes) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-105NOTICE of Appearance by Hong-An Vu (Vu, Hong-An) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-106NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Chen (Chen, Ian) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-107Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-108Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-109Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1010NOTICE of Appearance by Vasudha Talla (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1011NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Harumi Mass (Mass, Julia) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1112MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12502511.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Els, Andrea) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-1113Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Andrea S. Els representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1614CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California re 3 Notice of Appearance, 1 Complaint, 9 Summons Issued as to USA, 6 Notice of Appearance, 4 Notice of Appearance, 5 Notice of Appearance (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 7/16/2018) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-1715NOTICE of Appearance by Gioconda R. Molinari (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 7/17/2018) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-2016CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 7/20/2018) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-2017CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California.. (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 7/20/2018) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-2618STIPULATION to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 7/26/2018) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-09-0619ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 9/6/2018) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-2120ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 9/21/2018) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2121ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (By Parties And Counsel) (Chatterjee, Indra) (Filed on 9/21/2018) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
2018-09-2622Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-29Set/Reset Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. The court has a scheduling conflict with the initial CMC on 10/11/2018 and resets it to 11/1/2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 9/29/2018) (Entered: 09/29/2018)
2018-10-2523NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lorraine Crook (Crook, Jamie) (Filed on 10/25/2018) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-2524CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 10/25/2018) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-11-0125Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/1/2018. Parties are to confer within two weeks and to include agency counsel in the conference to identify an approach to document production. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2019. Total Time in Court: 22 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Vasudha Talla and Indra Chatterjee. Defendant's Attorney: Gioconda Molinari. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2018) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2019-01-0226STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEADLINE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 1/2/2019) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-0327Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part 26 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference and Deadline for Case Management Statement. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 1/17/2019 is reset to 2/14/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-02-0628CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: The court advances the start time of the CMC set for 2/14/2019 from 11:00 to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-0729CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2019) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-1430Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2019. The court asks agency counsel to file some representation in the form of a letter of the agency burden by 2/28/2019. Further Case Management Conference Call set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. The court will circulate a call-in number separately. Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Andrew Ong, Vasudha Talla and Jamie Crook. Defendant's Attorney: Gioconda Molinari. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2019) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-2831RESPONSE re 29 Case Management Statement, 30 Case Management Conference - Further,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, Defendant's Declaration Regarding Burden by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of ICE Deputy FOIA Officer Toni Fuentes)(Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 2/28/2019) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-0132CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Attachment A)(Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 3/1/2019) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-0733CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALL: Further Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM is reset to 11:00 AM . The call-in information remains the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0834Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/8/2019. The court held a case-management conference. The plaintiffs will give the defendants a narrowed version of their FOIA request (as specific as possible) within a week. The government will confer with the client and within a week of receipt, will update the plaintiffs about any proposed narrowing and the time period for collection of the records. After the time period for collection of the records has lapsed, the government will update the plaintiffs about the volume of records collected and propose a time period for producing that information. If the request is sufficiently narrow, this may allow production to the plaintiffs by May. Thereafter, the parties will confer about a timeline for further narrowed requests or the production of a Vaughn index (and will discuss whether the agency might produce a rolling Vaughn index based on the plaintiffs' prioritization of certain productions). As a calendaring device, the court sets a further case-management conference for June 20, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. and directs the parties to file an updated case-management statement by June 13, 2019. The parties may adjust this case-management conference by stipulation (and may request an earlier conference if it would be helpful). (Not Reported). Further Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/13/2019. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Vasudha Talla, Jaime Crook (Phone) and Andrew Ong (Phone). Defendant's Attorney: Gioconda Molinari. Also appearing by phone: Kristin Brudy-Everett and Kishore Khan. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-06-1335JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Attachment A)(Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-2036Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/20/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2019. Total Time in Court: 13 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Andrew Ong and Jaime Crook. Defendant's Attorney: Gioconda Molinari. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2637NOTICE by G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. Notice of Related Case Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 to be filed in Case No 3:18-cv-04105; Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L. R 7-11 (Dorny, A.) (Filed on 6/26/2019) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-2838RESPONSE re 37 Notice (Other), (Plaintiffs' Response to Notice of Related Case and Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related) by Floricel Liborio Ramos, Maria de Jesus Medina Ramirez, Maria Valdovinos Diaz, Yolanda Vallejo Medrano. (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2839RESPONSE re 37 Notice (Other), (Plaintiff's Response to Notice of Related Case and Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related) by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2840RESPONSE re 37 Notice (Other), FEDERAL DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES 18-4105-LB and 19-2757-JD SHOULD BE RELATED by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-0541REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RELATED CASE by G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. (Dorny, A.) (Filed on 7/5/2019) Modified on 7/8/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-0842ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds that the cases are related: C18-4105 LB and C19-2757 JD. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 07/08/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-09-1043NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kenneth Warren Brakebill (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/10/2019) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-1944CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Ong, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2019) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-2345CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-2346NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Vasudha Talla (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 9/23/2019) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-2747Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/26/2019. Court orders production increased to 750-pages per month to commence in October. Parties will confer and update the court in one week regarding Magistrate Judge preference for settlement conference. Scheduling order to issue in CV 19-2757. (Not Reported). Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Indra Chatterjee, Vasudha Talla and Hayes Hyde. Defendants' Attorneys: Kenneth Brakebill (US Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement) and Louis Dorny (G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar