Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFIX THE COURT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01620
Date Filed2018-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffFIX THE COURT
Case DescriptionFix the Court submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning correspondence between the agency and Brett Kavanaugh from 2001-2006 when he worked for the Bush administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency subsequently told Fix the Court that its request had not yet been processed. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Fix the Court filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5578844) filed by FIX THE COURT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FIX THE COURT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjd) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-114ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/11/2018. (DM) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-165WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 7/24/2018..... MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FIX THE COURT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to Roth Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Roth Declaration)(France, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/7/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-166NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Wolfson Young on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-167NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-168MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th St NW, B-255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 2028973918. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5589254. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FIX THE COURT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Plaintiff's 5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The Court has arranged a teleconference on the record with the parties on JULY 17, 2018, at 10:00 AM , to discuss the status of the FOIA request at issue and to identify a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's 5 motion. The Court requests that the parties call Chambers, preferably via the same telephone line. The Court also has received Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice , with respect to Katherine M. Anthony. Plaintiff's 8 motion is GRANTED CONTINGENT upon Ms. Anthony's submission of a declaration by JULY 23, 2018 , stating that she has reviewed and is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 16, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-16Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference on the record set for 7/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-179RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/12/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/16/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/16/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-1710NOTICE of Declaration in Further Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine M. Anthony by FIX THE COURT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-17MINUTE ORDER: The Court held a teleconference on the record with the parties on July 17, 2018, regarding Plaintiff's 5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The parties agreed that the Government's current process of assembling documents potentially responsive to the FOIA request at issue and indicating the rate at which it can process those documents should obviate the need for further briefing of Plaintiff's 5 Motion. With the parties' consent, the Court sets the following expedited deadlines for Defendant's response to the merits of Plaintiff's FOIA case. Defendant shall file a Status Report identifying the number of potentially responsive documents at issue by JULY 23, 2018, at 5:00 PM . Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with further information regarding Defendant's anticipated rate of processing, proposed schedule for production, any intention of interagency consultation, and any expected claims of exemptions by JULY 24, 2018, at 12:00 PM . The parties shall confer and submit a Joint Status Report by JULY 24, 2018, at 5:00 PM , with their joint proposed plan for review and release of the documents at issue. The Court shall HOLD IN ABEYANCE Plaintiff's 5 Motion pending further order of the Court. The Court also notes that at least one counsel for each party that appeared in the teleconference on July 17, 2018, had not previously entered an appearance in this case. The Court instructs each such counsel to enter an appearance on the docket. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 17, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-1711NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ridgely Evers on behalf of FIX THE COURT (Evers, Austin) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/17/2018) (ztd). (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-1712NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Michelle Kopplin on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall confer and submit a Joint Status Report by JULY 24, 2018, at 5:00 PM, with their joint proposed plan for review and release of the documents at issue. (dot) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-17Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Telephone Conference held on 7/17/2018. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards.) (dot) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-2313First STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Young, Danielle) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2414Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-2415ORDER. Defendant shall comply with the processing and production schedule set forth in this Order. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report not later than OCTOBER 1, 2018 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 24, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-2416NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by FIX THE COURT re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2018. (dot) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-1017ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Young, Danielle) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar