Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. v. U.S. CENSUS BUREAU et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01629
Date Filed2018-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC.
Case DescriptionProtect Democracy Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce, the U.S. Bureau of the Census, the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Justice, and OMB for records concerning the inclusion of a citizenship question on the 2020 Census form. PDP also requested a fee waiver. The Census Bureau denied PDP's request for a fee waiver because the organization had not provided sufficient evidence that its request was in the public interest. The Commerce Department eventually closed the request. The other agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, PDP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantThe U.S. Census Bureau
DefendantU.S. CENSUS BUREAU
DefendantThe U.S. Department of Commerce
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantThe U.S. Department Of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantThe U.S. Department of Justice Office of Information Policy
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
DefendantThe Office of Management and Budget
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-101COMPLAINT against The Office of Management and Budget, The U.S. Census Bureau, The U.S. Department Of Homeland Security, The U.S. Department of Commerce, The U.S. Department of Justice Office of Information Policy, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5580758) filed by Protect Democracy Project, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Summons Census, # 25 Summons Commerce, # 26 Summons DOJ OIP, # 27 Summons Homeland Security, # 28 Summons ICE, # 29 Summons OMB)(Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-102Corporate Disclosure Statement by Protect Democracy Project, Inc. (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-103NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Protect Democracy Project, Inc. Case related to Case No. 17-2561; 18-379; 18-1628. (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-11Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-124SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. CENSUS BUREAU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/15/2018. (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-236ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 7/16/2018. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 8/6/2018. (Lawson, Dennis) Modified on 7/24/2018 (zjf). (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 7/16/2018 (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-238RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 7/20/2018 (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-239RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/16/2018 (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY served on 7/17/2018 (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2311RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 7/16/2018 (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-2312RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CENSUS BUREAU served on 7/23/2018 (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-24NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 6 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error at the request of counsel and will refile for issuance of correct summons as to the U.S. Attorney General. (jf) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-2413REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC..(Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-2414SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-2715RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/27/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2018. (Lawson, Dennis) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-2716NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. CENSUS BUREAU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-2717ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. CENSUS BUREAU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-1818ORDER directing the parties to file a Vaughn Index due by 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/14/18. (lsj) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-1519Consent MOTION to Vacate 18 Order, Set Deadlines by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. CENSUS BUREAU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1720ORDER granting 19 Motion to Vacate; parties shall file Joint Status Report by 11/16/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/17/2018. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar