Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWATSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01645
Date Filed2018-07-09
Date Closed2019-11-25
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffBOBBY KEITH WATSON
Case DescriptionBobby Watson submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of Tennessee and the FBI for records of a specific investigation conducted by the FBI. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI told Watson that it had already disclosed responsive records as a result of two earlier FOIA requests filed by Watson. Watson filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy, which upheld the FBI's initial decision. After hearing nothing from the U.S. Attorney's Office, Watson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE Eastern District of Tennessee
DefendantU.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [40]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-09Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/09/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-091COMPLAINT against U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by BOBBY KEITH WATSON.(zsb) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-092MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BOBBY KEITH WATSON (zsb) (tempaty2, ). (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-193FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/19/2018. (zsb) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-19Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsb) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-244SUMMONS (5) Issued as to U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (zsb). (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-08-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 7/30/2018. (tth) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/2/2018. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/2/2018. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/2/2018. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/1/2018.) (tth) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-037RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE served on 8/2/2018. (tth) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-308Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-309NOTICE of Proposed Order by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia); Modified text on 8/31/2018 (tth). (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-31MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 8 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. Accordingly, the defendants' response to the plaintiff's complaint shall be filed on or before October 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 31, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/3/2018. (JK) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-2810Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-03MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendants' response to the complaint shall be filed on or before November 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 3, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/2/2018. (JK) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-11-0111MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants' 11 Motion for Enlargement of Time, which the plaintiff does not oppose, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The defendants' response to the complaint shall be filed on or before November 14, 2018. Because this is the third extension sought by the defendants, no further extensions will be permitted. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 2, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-1412ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-20MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 20, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-3013MOTION for Summary Judgment by BOBBY KEITH WATSON (zrdj) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-04MINUTE ORDER. On November 20, 2018, the Court entered an order requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file on or before December 18, 2018 a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. On December 3, 2018, the plaintiff filed a motion for summary judgment 13 . The plaintiff's motion is premature. Pursuant to the Court's November 20, 2018 order, the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 18, 2018 that proposes a schedule for further proceedings and addresses the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 4, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-1814STATUS REPORT by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-18MINUTE ORDER. It has come to the Court's attention that the pro se plaintiff may not have received the Court's November 1, 2018, November 20, 2018, and December 4, 2018 minute orders. Accordingly, the due date for the parties' joint status report is extended to January 31, 2019 to give both parties additional time to comply with the Court's November 20, 2018 minute order requiring them to meet and confer and propose a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 18, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2019-01-2215STATUS REPORT by BOBBY KEITH WATSON. (tth) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-3116STATUS REPORT by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-13MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiff's 15 Status Report and the defendant's 16 Status Report indicate that the parties have not yet complied with the Court's November 20, 2018 and December 4, 2018 minute orders directing them to confer. Both reports suggest that the parties have not conferred because the plaintiff believes it is futile to confer because he has filed a motion for summary judgment. As the Court made clear in its order of December 4, 2018, the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is premature and will not be considered at this time. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff shall comply with the Court's orders to confer with defense counsel to prepare a joint status report and propose a schedule for further proceedings. The joint status report shall be filed on or before April 3, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this minute order to the plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 13, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-03-0417SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 15 Status Report filed by BOBBY KEITH WATSON. (ztd) (Main Document 17 replaced on 3/7/2019) (ztd). (Main Document 17 replaced on 3/8/2019) (ztd). (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-04-0418MOTION for Leave to File by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Errata JSR/Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05NOTICE OF ERROR re 18 Motion for Leave to File; emailed to patricia.mcbride@usdoj.gov, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Please do not refile. Future filings must be signed by counsel. (ztth, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 18 Motion for Leave to Late File their Joint Status Report. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 15, 2019. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this minute order to the plaintiff at his address of record. Signed Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 5, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/07/2019)
2019-04-25MINUTE ORDER denying the plaintiff's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice, in light of the Court's December 4, 2018 Minute Order informing the plaintiff that his motion is premature. Once discovery is complete and the parties have filed a post-discovery status report, the Court will set a briefing schedule. At that time, the plaintiff may file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 25, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-05-1519STATUS REPORT by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/15/2019)
2019-05-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 16, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-06-1920Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 26, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2019. (kh) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-3021Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 30, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2019. (zcal) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-2922STATUS REPORT by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of defendants' 22 Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report, including a proposed briefing schedule, on or before September 20, 2019. The plaintiff's continued failure to meet and confer may result in this case being dismissed. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 30, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-2323MOTION for Leave to File by U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-10-15MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 23 Motion for Leave to Late File their Joint Status Report. The defendants have indicated that they have not been able to reach the plaintiff since July 29, 2019. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff shall show cause on or before November 12, 2019 why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 83.23 of the Local Rules. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this minute order to the plaintiff at his address of record. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 15, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-11-2524ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. See text for details. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 25, 2019. (Entered: 11/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar