Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01655
Date Filed2018-07-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications to or from Associate Deputy Director David Bowdich, Chief of Staff Jim Rybicki, or Deputy Chief of Staff Dawn Burton mentioning the firing of James Comey. Property of the People also requested Comey's calendar for the period beginning May 12, 2017. Property of the People also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and divided it into two separate requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-07-131COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5586784) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Strugar, Matthew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-132LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Strugar, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/16/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2018. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-265ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/26/18. (DM) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-206NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-237ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-238ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by no later than SEPTEMBER 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/23/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2018. (dot) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-09-139Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-14MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report. The parties represent that the FBI is currently searching for responsive records to Plaintiff's FOIA request. The FBI anticipates that its search will conclude by September 28, 2018. Once the search has concluded, the parties will be able to propose a processing and production schedule. The parties are ORDERED to file another Joint Status Report by no later than OCTOBER 31, 2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request. The parties are further ORDERED to file additional Joint Status Reports every 30 days thereafter. The parties are also free to file Joint Status Reports between the filing deadlines if issues arise that require the Court's attention. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/14/2018. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2018, updating the Court on the status of Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request. (dot) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-10-3110Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar